HI SR137 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR137
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of Term, Non-exclusive Easements Covering Portions Of State Submerged Lands At Waiohuli-keokea (kihei), Wailuku, Maui, Hawaii, For The Use, Maintenance, And Repair Of The Existing Seawall Constructed Thereon.
Title
Authorizing The Issuance Of Term, Non-exclusive Easements Covering Portions Of State Submerged Lands At Waiohuli-keokea (kihei), Wailuku, Maui, Hawaii, For The Use, Maintenance, And Repair Of The Existing Seawall Constructed Thereon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR137 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=137&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR137_.HTM |