HI SR133 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress To Take Immediate And Decisive Action To Support Middle- And Lower-income Households In America.
Title
Urging Congress To Take Immediate And Decisive Action To Support Middle- And Lower-income Households In America.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3557) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR156 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
Subjects
Congress
Emergency Preparedness
Gun Control
Infrastructure Improvements
Mental Health
Middle and Lower Income Households
Public Health
Universal Healthcare
Emergency Preparedness
Gun Control
Infrastructure Improvements
Mental Health
Middle and Lower Income Households
Public Health
Universal Healthcare