HI SR133 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR133
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Human Resources Development To Reexamine The Qualifications For State Positions That Are Currently Vacant And Replace The Qualification Of A Bachelor's Degree With An Associate Degree Or Certificate, Where Applicable
Title
Urging The Department Of Human Resources Development To Reexamine The Qualifications For State Positions That Are Currently Vacant And Replace The Qualification Of A Bachelor's Degree With An Associate Degree Or Certificate, Where Applicable
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1307) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 3:05PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to LCA. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR133 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR168 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 32
SCR168 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 32