HI SR13 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR13
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That Joint Base Pearl Harbor-hickam And The Division Of Boating And Ocean Recreation Of The Department Of Land And Natural Resources Collaborate To Establish A Recreational Area In The East Loch Of Pearl Harbor.
Title
Requesting That Joint Base Pearl Harbor-hickam And The Division Of Boating And Ocean Recreation Of The Department Of Land And Natural Resources Collaborate To Establish A Recreational Area In The East Loch Of Pearl Harbor.
Sponsors
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from PSM/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3807) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-22 1:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WTL. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR13 (Carry Over) 2021-03-04 - The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-05-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
HR92 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to WAL/CMV, FIN, referral sheet 27
SCR19 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HR92 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to WAL/CMV, FIN, referral sheet 27
SCR19 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.