HI SR13 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Take Certain Actions To Improve Job Creation And Business Climate.
Title
Job Creation; Economic Diversification; Incentives; Business
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1116), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Dela Cruz, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, Harimoto. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 2:50PM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to EDT, WAM. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Offered. |