HI SR128 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Transportation To Establish A Working Group To Evaluate Options That Provide Additional Air Service To Remote And Underserved Communities Across The State.
Title
Urging The Department Of Transportation To Establish A Working Group To Evaluate Options That Provide Additional Air Service To Remote And Underserved Communities Across The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-23. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1459) with recommendation of adoption. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-23 3:01PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to TCA. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR170 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.