HI SR128 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR128
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii State Department Of Transportation To Convene A Working Group And Various Committees To Create And Recommend State And County Subsidies And Federal Funding For The Transport Of Waterborne Cargo Consistent With The Findings And Recommendations Of The Water Carriers Working Group's Final Report.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii State Department Of Transportation To Convene A Working Group And Various Committees To Create And Recommend State And County Subsidies And Federal Funding For The Transport Of Waterborne Cargo Consistent With The Findings And Recommendations Of The Water Carriers Working Group's Final Report.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). |
2022-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from TRS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3665) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR128 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
HR180 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR144 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 45
HR180 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR144 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 45