HI SR124 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating And Honoring The Life Of Robert William Kalanihiapo Wilcox, An Enduring Patriot And Advocate For The Rights Of Native Hawaiians, Who Served As Hawaii's First Elected Representative To The United States Congress.
Title
Robert William Kalanihiapo Wilcox; Hawaiian Government
Sponsors
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-31 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-16. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3259) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Inouye, Kim, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-16 1:16PM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HWN. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |