HI SR123 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State Public Charter School Commission To Continue Efforts To Address Public School Capacity Issues Through Charter School Applicants And Make Recommendations On How To Strengthen These Efforts.
Title
State Public Charter School Commission; Public School Overcrowding
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1189), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, Kouchi, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=123&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SR123_.HTM |