HI SR121 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR121
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging All Applicable State Agencies To Work Together With Interested Stakeholders, Including The Honolulu Harbor Users Group, In Assessing The Risk Of Aquatic Invasive Species To Hawaii, Vectors, And Possible Mitigations, In Preparation For The Establishment Of New Federal Standards In 2022.
Title
Urging All Applicable State Agencies To Work Together With Interested Stakeholders, Including The Honolulu Harbor Users Group, In Assessing The Risk Of Aquatic Invasive Species To Hawaii, Vectors, And Possible Mitigations, In Preparation For The Establishment Of New Federal Standards In 2022.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-02-19. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported from GVO/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1677) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to GVO/AEN. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR121 (Carry Over) 2019-04-02 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=121&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR121_.HTM |