HI SR119 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - (S) Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - (S) Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requests The Office Of The Auditor To Review And Compare The Health Care Benefits Available Under The Medicaid Program And The Prepaid Health Care Act.
Title
Auditor report comparing Medicaid and Prepaid Health Care Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | (S) Resolution Adopted. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) One Day Notice 04-08-10. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2931), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Hee. | |
2010-03-25 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-10 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-03-15 | (S) Referred to LBR, WAM. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR239 (Same As) 2010-04-15 - (H) Re-referred to HUS/HLT, referral sheet 71