HI SCR239 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - (H) Re-referred to HUS/HLT, referral sheet 71
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - (H) Re-referred to HUS/HLT, referral sheet 71
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requests The Office Of The Auditor To Review And Compare The Health Care Benefits Available Under The Medicaid Program And The Prepaid Health Care Act.
Title
Auditor report comparing Medicaid and Prepaid Health Care Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | (H) Re-referred to HUS/HLT, referral sheet 71 | |
2010-04-12 | (H) Referred to HUS/HLT, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 66 | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 518) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) One Day Notice 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Waived referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2930), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Hee. | |
2010-03-25 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-10 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-03-15 | (S) Referred to LBR, WAM. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR119 (Same As) 2010-04-08 - (S) Resolution Adopted.