HI SR117 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture And Department Of Health To Conduct A Joint Study Of The Short-term And Long-term Effects Of Chlorpyrifos On Farmworkers.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture And Department Of Health To Conduct A Joint Study Of The Short-term And Long-term Effects Of Chlorpyrifos On Farmworkers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/CPH deferred the measure until 04-04-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to AEN/CPH. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR201 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=117&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SR117_.HTM |