HI SR110 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR110
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Ka Huli Ao Center For Excellence In Native Hawaiian Law To Establish A Working Group To Return Crown Lands To Native Hawaiians.
Title
Requesting The Ka Huli Ao Center For Excellence In Native Hawaiian Law To Establish A Working Group To Return Crown Lands To Native Hawaiians.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3652) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Acasio, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fevella. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-22 1:01PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HWN. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR110 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to PSM/AEN.
HR145 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 27
SCR125 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 45
HR145 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 27
SCR125 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 45