HI SR102 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-30 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-30 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Planning To Convene A Task Force To Review All State And County Land Use Practices And Develop Recommendations To Reduce Urban Sprawl, Properly Develop Urban Areas, And Revise County Laws To Reflect Strategic Land Use Practices For Main Street Redevelopment That Support Public Transportation.
Title
Land Use Task Force; Urban Sprawl
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3116), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fukunaga, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-12 1:25PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to WLH, WAM. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) Offered. |