HI SCR99 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Allow Teachers To Use Purchasing Cards When Purchasing School Supplies And Other Related Curriculum Support Supplies.
Title
Department of Education; Purchasing Cards; Declining Balance Purchasing Cards; Teachers
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1178), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Nishihara. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |