HI SCR86 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR86
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Board Of Education To Redistrict Students Who Will Be Living In The Koa Ridge Development To The Pearl City-waipahu Complex Area.
Title
Requesting The Board Of Education To Redistrict Students Who Will Be Living In The Koa Ridge Development To The Pearl City-waipahu Complex Area.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2039-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-13 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ing, McKelvey, Quinlan. |
2018-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 04-13-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 521). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3502) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3245), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kim. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR86 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=86&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR86_.HTM |