HI SCR84 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Driver Education And Licensing Programs To Emphasize Courteous And Responsible Driving, Including The Reduction Of Traffic Congestion.
Title
Driver Training and Education Programs; Curriculum; Safe Driving
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 51 |
2015-04-09 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 48 |
2015-04-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 406). |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-15. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Reported from TRA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1297) with recommendation of adoption. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Inouye, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Slom. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to TRA. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=84&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SCR84_.HTM |