HI SCR84 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Restore The Presumption Of A Service Connection For Agent Orange Exposure To United States Veterans Who Served In The Waters Defined By The Combat Zone And In The Airspace Over The Combat Zone In Vietnam.
Title
Veterans; Vietnam; Agent Orange
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 709). |
2014-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-21 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Oshiro excused (2). |
2014-04-21 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1686-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-04-16 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Awana, Cachola, Onishi, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Choy, Ohno, McDermott, Wooley. |
2014-04-15 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-04-14 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 04-16-14 9:00AM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 04-16-14 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to VMI, referral sheet 49 |
2014-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 415). |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-14. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3149) with recommendation of adoption. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-14 1:35PM in conference room 224. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=84&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/SCR84_.HTM |