HI SCR84 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting The Hawaii Public Housing Authority's Application For A Choice Neighborhoods Grant And Urging The United States Department Of Housing And Urban Development To Select The Hawaii Public Housing Authority As A Choice Neighborhoods Grant Recipient.
Title
Hawaii Public Housing Authority; Choice Neighborhoods Grant
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 716). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-27-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Re-referred to HSG, referral sheet 76 | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1822-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-04-25 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Ito, Carroll, Chang, Coffman, Kawakami, Nakashima, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Herkes, Thielen. | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 04-25-12 3:00PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 66 | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 708) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3404) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. | |
2012-04-11 | (S) The committee on HMS will reconsider its previous decision on 04-11-12 and will hold a public decision making on 04-12-12 3:10PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-04-11 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Re-Referred to HMS. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-11-12 10:00AM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-28-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-12 10:00AM in conference room 224. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) Offered. |