HI SCR82 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR82
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Performance Audit Of The Department Of Health, Hawaii State Hospital, And Hawaii Information Portal.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Performance Audit Of The Department Of Health, Hawaii State Hospital, And Hawaii Information Portal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 752). |
2022-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-22 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Marten, McKelvey, Ohno, Tokioka excused (5). |
2022-04-22 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2129-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-04-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Branco, Nishimoto, Wildberger, McDermott. |
2022-04-19 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-21-22 1:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-19 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3). |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2082-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-04-14 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Har. |
2022-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 04-14-22 9:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-04 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 42 |
2022-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 563). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-22. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3526) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HTH. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR82 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to EET/LCA.
Subjects
Department of Health
Hawaii Information Portal
Hawaii State Hospital
Performance Audit
Report
State Auditor
Hawaii Information Portal
Hawaii State Hospital
Performance Audit
Report
State Auditor