HI SCR82 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR82
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to PBS/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to PBS/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Task Force Established Pursuant To H.c.r. No. 85, H.d. 2, S.d. 1, Regular Session Of 2016, To Submit A Report On The Current Status, Staffing, Resources, Curriculum, And Levels Of Staff Participation At The Current Department Of Public Safety Training Academy.
Title
Requesting The Task Force Established Pursuant To H.c.r. No. 85, H.d. 2, S.d. 1, Regular Session Of 2016, To Submit A Report On The Current Status, Staffing, Resources, Curriculum, And Levels Of Staff Participation At The Current Department Of Public Safety Training Academy.
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to PBS/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2017-04-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 437) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1420) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1238), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR82 (Carry Over) 2017-04-07 - Referred to PBS/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 41