HI SCR76 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR76
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Board Of Agriculture To Prohibit Unapproved Residential Use Of Farm Dwellings In Agricultural Parks.
Title
Requesting The Board Of Agriculture To Prohibit Unapproved Residential Use Of Farm Dwellings In Agricultural Parks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 775). |
2022-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-25 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2147-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-04-21 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McKelvey, Ward. |
2022-04-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 04-21-22 1:30PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2). |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2039-22), recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-04-13 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2022-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 04-13-22 11:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-04 | House | Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 42 |
2022-04-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 578). |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, San Buenaventura. Noes, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-01-22. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3566) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to AEN. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR76 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 32
SR69 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
SR69 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.