HI SCR76 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Hawaii State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Commission A Monument To President Barack Obama.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Hawaii State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Commission A Monument To President Barack Obama.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1632), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 3:00PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-11SenateReferred to LCA, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR39 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback