HI SCR74 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR74
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Education And Other Agency And Community Stakeholders To Continue Meeting As A Working Group For Sexual Violence Prevention Education In Public Schools.
Title
Encouraging The Department Of Education And Other Agency And Community Stakeholders To Continue Meeting As A Working Group For Sexual Violence Prevention Education In Public Schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2249) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say, Tokioka. |
2019-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 04-11-19 9:15AM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 605). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1804) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-19 10:10AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to JDC. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1624), with recommendation of referral to JDC. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR74 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).