HI SCR71 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ito, Rhoads excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ito, Rhoads excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Emergency Management Agency To Conduct A Study Regarding The Feasibility And Cost Of Constructing A Small, Rural Landing Site Or Airstrip For Use By The National Guard And Emergency Responders In South Puna And Evaluate The Possibility Of Using Basalt Rebar Or Lunar Basaltic Cement In The Construction.
Title
Emergency Management; Hawaii Island; Landing Site; PISCES; Basalt Rebar Initiative
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ito, Rhoads excused (3). |
2015-04-20 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1667), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-04-16 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Yamashita, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, San Buenaventura, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har, Nakashima, Tupola. |
2015-04-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 04-16-15 10:05AM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-14 | House | Re-referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2015-04-10 | House | Referred to PBS/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 49 |
2015-04-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 448) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1378) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-07-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |