HI SCR7 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR7
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH/HET, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH/HET, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Enterprise Technology Services, In Collaboration With The National Federation Of The Blind Of Hawaii, To Convene A Working Group On Accessible Government Documents.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Enterprise Technology Services, In Collaboration With The National Federation Of The Blind Of Hawaii, To Convene A Working Group On Accessible Government Documents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to HHH/HET, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 475) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HMS/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1316) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 3:45PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to HMS/GVO. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR7 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH/HET, FIN, referral sheet 32
HCR31 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Referred to HHH/HET, FIN, referral sheet 15
SR5 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HCR31 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Referred to HHH/HET, FIN, referral sheet 15
SR5 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.