HI SCR69 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR69
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Education To Increase Access To Trauma-informed Care For Public School Students Who Experience Sexual Violence.
Title
Urging The Department Of Education To Increase Access To Trauma-informed Care For Public School Students Who Experience Sexual Violence.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR69 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=69&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SCR69_.HTM |