HI SCR69 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting Every Commercial Or Public Building Located On Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands Trust Land To Display A Work Of Art Commemorating Prince Jonah Kuhio Kalanianaole And A Description Of His Achievements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting Every Commercial Or Public Building Located On Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands Trust Land To Display A Work Of Art Commemorating Prince Jonah Kuhio Kalanianaole And A Description Of His Achievements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
2019-04-15HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2260), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-04-12HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
2019-04-10HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 04-12-19 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 49
2019-04-02HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 552) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-02SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-01SenateOne Day Notice 04-02-19.
2019-04-01SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1672) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:18PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-13SenateRe-Referred to HWN.
2019-03-11SenateReferred to HWN/CPH.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR71 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback