HI SCR69 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor To Appoint A Long-term Care Coordinator.
Title
Long-Term Care Coordinator; Kupuna Caucus
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS/HTH deferred the measure until 03-28-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-12 2:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to HMS/HTH, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=69 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SCR69_.HTM |