HI SCR66 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Human Services, Department Of Education, And Executive Office On Early Learning To Collaborate And Explore The Feasibility Of Expanding The Early Head Start Program To Include A Broader Range Of Incomes.
Title
Early Head Start; Eligibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from HSH/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1232), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Kouchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Slom. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 04-01-15 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred to HSH/EDU, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |