HI SCR62 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR62
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor's Coordinator On Homelessness And The City And County Of Honolulu To Collaborate And Prioritize Their Homelessness Efforts In The Area Surrounding The Hawaii Children's Discovery Center By Convening A Task Force.
Title
Urging The Governor's Coordinator On Homelessness And The City And County Of Honolulu To Collaborate And Prioritize Their Homelessness Efforts In The Area Surrounding The Hawaii Children's Discovery Center By Convening A Task Force.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2236), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-12 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2019-04-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 04-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 601) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1821) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from HMS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1540), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Harimoto. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HMS/PSM, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR62 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
HCR36 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR36 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.