HI SCR59 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR59
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging All State Departments And Agencies To Duly Consider Women-, Veteran-, And Native Hawaiian-owned Businesses When Awarding State Contracts, And Requesting All State Departments And Agencies To Submit To The Legislature A List Of State Contracts Awarded In The Last Two Years To Women-, Veteran-, And Native Hawaiian-owned Businesses.
Title
Urging All State Departments And Agencies To Duly Consider Women-, Veteran-, And Native Hawaiian-owned Businesses When Awarding State Contracts, And Requesting All State Departments And Agencies To Submit To The Legislature A List Of State Contracts Awarded In The Last Two Years To Women-, Veteran-, And Native Hawaiian-owned Businesses.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2017-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-21 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Souki, Takumi, Tokioka excused (8). |
2017-04-21 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1817), recommending adoption. |
2017-04-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Quinlan. |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-20-17 10:45AM in conference room 308. |
2017-04-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, C. Lee, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (6). |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1804), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-04-13 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima. |
2017-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 04-13-17 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2017-04-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 432) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1454) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1221), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Galuteria, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 2:47PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR59 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Subjects
Native Hawaiian-Owned Businesses
State Procurement Contracts
Veteran-Owned Businesses
Women-Owned Businesses
State Procurement Contracts
Veteran-Owned Businesses
Women-Owned Businesses