HI SCR57 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to HLT, CPC, LMG, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to HLT, CPC, LMG, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Requiring Health Insurers To Provide Coverage For Survivors Of Traumatic Brain Injuries.
Title
Brain Injuries; Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, LMG, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 625) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1450) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1155), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Slom. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-13 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to HTH/CPN, WAM. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=57&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR57_.HTM |