HI SCR56 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR56
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor To Convene And Participate In The Hawaii Circular Economy Task Force That Supports Hawaii's Transition Toward A Circular Economy By 2035.
Title
Requesting The Governor To Convene And Participate In The Hawaii Circular Economy Task Force That Supports Hawaii's Transition Toward A Circular Economy By 2035.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1733) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-04-06 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 04-06-21 10:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 503) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1422) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-21 3:10PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to EET/AEN. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR56 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SR38 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR38 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.