HI SR38 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR38
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting An Economic Transition That Combats Climate Change And Incorporates Circular Economy Goals Rooted In Aloha Aina Principles.
Title
Supporting An Economic Transition That Combats Climate Change And Incorporates Circular Economy Goals Rooted In Aloha Aina Principles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1423) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-21 3:10PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to EET/AEN. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR38 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR56 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SCR56 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).