HI SCR52 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Sunset Memorial Park Working Group To Study Potential Solutions And Make Recommendations For A Long-term Management Plan, For Sunset Memorial Park.
Title
Requesting The Convening Of A Sunset Memorial Park Working Group To Study Potential Solutions And Make Recommendations For A Long-term Management Plan, For Sunset Memorial Park.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-24 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2). |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2181) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2023-04-13 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden. |
2023-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 04-13-23 9:00AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2023-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 578) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-23. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1543) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to CPN/WTL. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR29 (Same As) 2023-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SR47 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
SR47 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.