HI SCR51 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The United States Congress To Repeal Section 340 Of Public Law No. 105-66 Prohibiting The Transfer Of Airport Revenue To The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs And To Affirmatively Authorize The Hawaii State Department Of Transportation To Transfer A Portion Of The Airport Revenues To The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ceded Lands; Repeal of Public Law 105-66

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-01SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2013-04-01SenateReported from PSM/TIA/THA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1133), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2013-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kahele, Kouchi, Slom.
2013-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
2013-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in THA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Slom.
2013-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on PSM/TIA/THA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-13 1:15PM in conference room 224.
2013-03-05SenateReferred to PSM/TIA/THA, WAM.
2013-02-28SenateOffered.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback