HI SCR48 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Probable Effects Of Licensing And Regulating Clean And Sober Homes.
Title
Clean and Sober Homes; Voluntary Registry; County Zoning
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Monday, 04-14-14 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2014-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 452). |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3220) with recommendation of adoption. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3108), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-14 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=48&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/SCR48_.HTM |