HI SCR47 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR47
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing Volunteer Week In The State Of Hawaii.
Title
Recognizing Volunteer Week In The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2230), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamashita. |
2019-04-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 04-11-19 10:30AM in conference room 309. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 595) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1753) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to LCA. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR47 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).