HI SCR43 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-30 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to EDU.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-30 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to EDU.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Board Of Education And Department Of Education To Consider Utilizing Public School Facilities Facing Closure And Reutilizing Vacant Public School Facilities To Support The Needs Of The Community, Including But Not Limited To Kupuna-related Programs And Services, Thereby Avoiding Underutilization And Possible Closure Of Public School Facilities.
Title
Kupuna Caucus; School Facilities; Senior and Community Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to EDU. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3104), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to EDU. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Ihara. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-28-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-12 10:00AM in conference room 224. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Referred to HMS, EDU. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Offered. |