HI SCR37 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - (S) The committee on SCA01 deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - (S) The committee on SCA01 deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Financial And Management Audit Of Those State Agencies With Salary And Wage Overpayments.
Title
Audit; State Agencies; Salary Overpayments
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | (S) The committee on SCA01 deferred the measure. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on SCA01 has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-12 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-03-13 | (S) The committee on SCA01 deferred the measure. | |
2012-03-05 | (S) The committee(s) on SCA01 has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-12 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) Referred to SCA01 (Senate Special Committee on Accountability - 01). | |
2012-02-09 | (S) Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=37 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SCR37_.HTM |