HI SCR34 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Medical Association And Hawaii Psychiatric Medical Association To Convene A Roundtable To Establish Medical Protocols To Ensure That An Individual's Thyroid Function Is Tested Before Psychotropic Medications For Mental Illness Are Prescribed.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Medical Association And Hawaii Psychiatric Medical Association To Convene A Roundtable To Establish Medical Protocols To Ensure That An Individual's Thyroid Function Is Tested Before Psychotropic Medications For Mental Illness Are Prescribed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 784). |
2024-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-19 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garcia, Quinlan excused (3). |
2024-04-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1930-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-17 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam. |
2024-04-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 04-17-24 2:00PM in conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7). |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1873-24), recommending referral to CPC. |
2024-04-11 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Marten, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Garcia. |
2024-04-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 04-11-24 11:15AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 376). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3427) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Awa. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to HHS. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR144 (Same As) 2024-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Ganaden, Kapela, La Chica, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd excused (9).
Subjects
Hawaii Medical Association
Hawaii Psychiatric Medical Association
Medical Protocols
Psychotropic Medication Prescription
Roundtable
Thyroid Testing
Hawaii Psychiatric Medical Association
Medical Protocols
Psychotropic Medication Prescription
Roundtable
Thyroid Testing