HI SCR34 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR34

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The National Football League To Allow Injured Players To Use Cannabidiol In Pill Or Liquid Form, In Lieu Of Opioids, To Address The Pain From Their Work-related Injuries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The National Football League To Allow Injured Players To Use Cannabidiol In Pill Or Liquid Form, In Lieu Of Opioids, To Address The Pain From Their Work-related Injuries.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateReport adopted, referred to CPH.
2018-03-28SenateReported from LBR/ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3288), with recommendation of referral to CPH.
2018-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
2018-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on LBR/ETT added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-22-18 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to LBR/ETT, CPH.
2018-03-01SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SCR34 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to ETT/PSM, JDL.
HCR52 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback