HI SCR31 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR31
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Create A Task Force To Study The Approval Of Blockchain Technology And Cryptocurrency In The State.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Create A Task Force To Study The Approval Of Blockchain Technology And Cryptocurrency In The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 10:15AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to CPN/EET. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR31 (Carry Over) 2021-03-18 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
SR26 (Same As) 2022-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
SR26 (Same As) 2022-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=31&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SCR31_.HTM |