HI SCR26 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR26
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Empowerment Of Young Women By Recognizing October 11, 2021, As The International Day Of The Girl.
Title
Urging The Empowerment Of Young Women By Recognizing October 11, 2021, As The International Day Of The Girl.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-04-29 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 869). |
2021-04-29 | House | Received notice of reconsideration (Sen. Com. No. 869). |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-29-21. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-29-21. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-20-21 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2021-04-21 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 846). |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 597). |
2021-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-19 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Perruso excused (2). |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1892), recommending adoption. |
2021-04-15 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-15-21 11:00AM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-08 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1772) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-04-07 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Tam, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 04-07-21 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 489) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1300) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-21 3:10PM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to GVO. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR26 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HCR101 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SR15 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HCR101 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SR15 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.