HI SCR25 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Transportation And The Department Of Transportation Services Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Expand The Red-light Safety Program.
Title
Encouraging The Department Of Transportation And The Department Of Transportation Services Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Expand The Red-light Safety Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 740). |
2024-04-15 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-15 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe excused (6). |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1910-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-11 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 04-11-24 9:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to TRN, referral sheet 27 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 371) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from TCA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3534) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Awa. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to TCA/PSM. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Offered. |