HI SCR238 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR238
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Department Of Education, Hawaii High School Athletic Association, Big Island Interscholastic Federation, Oahu Interscholastic Association, Interscholastic League Of Honolulu, Maui Interscholastic League, And Kauai Interscholastic Federation Create A Plan To Implement Bass Fishing As A Sanctioned High School Sport.
Title
Requesting That The Department Of Education, Hawaii High School Athletic Association, Big Island Interscholastic Federation, Oahu Interscholastic Association, Interscholastic League Of Honolulu, Maui Interscholastic League, And Kauai Interscholastic Federation Create A Plan To Implement Bass Fishing As A Sanctioned High School Sport.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 587). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1312) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 3:15PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EDU/AEN. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR238 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 32
SR198 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR198 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.