HI SCR231 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR231
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Referred to HSG/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 47
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Referred to HSG/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 47
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Counties To Produce Land Use Plans That Account For Housing Production And Demand.
Title
Urging The Counties To Produce Land Use Plans That Account For Housing Production And Demand.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to HSG/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 47 |
2022-04-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 710) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from GVO/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3734) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Gabbard. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to GVO/HOU. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR231 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 32