HI SCR231 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR231
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Provide Recommendations For The Maintenance Of South Point Access Road For Motor Vehicles And Pedestrian Traffic.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Provide Recommendations For The Maintenance Of South Point Access Road For Motor Vehicles And Pedestrian Traffic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 583) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1446) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN will hold a public decision making on 03-30-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HWN. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR231 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 32
SR191 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR191 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.